This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/10/2022 at 17:06:34 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS ELENA GARVEY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELENA GARVEY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

GARVEY, ELENA

Miami, FL 33137-4473

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott E Modlin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/24/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/08/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: GARVEY ELENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120275AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110SUNRISE FL 33323-2832COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/08/2021REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050098AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110SUNRISE FL 33323-2832COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2021REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant