This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/16/2019 at 03:15:53 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS CONSTANZA ZAMORA

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONSTANZA ZAMORA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

ZAMORA, CONSTANZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jovanovich, Zoran David

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service

04/23/2019 - Certificate of Service

Default Final Judgment

04/22/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

04/19/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Judgment

04/19/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment

Affidavit as to Costs

04/19/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Final Disposition Document

04/19/2019 - Final Disposition Document

Default

04/05/2019 - Default

Service Returned

04/03/2019 - Service Returned

Affidavit of Indebtedness

04/02/2019 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Certificate of Plaintiff's Attorney

04/02/2019 - Certificate of Plaintiff's Attorney

Non-Military Affidavit

04/02/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

04/02/2019 - Motion for Default

Complaint

01/11/2019 - Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31412:1742; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ZAMORA CONSTANZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ZAMORA CONSTANZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Plaintiff's Attorney; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090012AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/16/2019 REGISTER#:209CASHIER:ORTEGAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ZAMORA CONSTANZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3610003AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $10,551.22

    Read MoreRead Less