This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/10/2021 at 09:46:32 (UTC).

AMERICAN AIRLINES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS WILLIAM DE CARDENAS

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 AMERICAN AIRLINES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM DE CARDENAS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Airlines Federal Credit Union

Defendant

De Cardenas, William

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sipple, Martin B

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/07/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/07/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/31/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

08/30/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/24/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

08/23/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Copy of:

08/23/2021 - Copy of:

Complaint

08/23/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/23/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970182AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SIPPLE, MARTIN B PO BOX 391 TALLAHASSEE FL 32302-0391 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/08/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970182AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SIPPLE, MARTIN B PO BOX 391 TALLAHASSEE FL 32302-0391 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/08/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: De Cardenas William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: De Cardenas William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020215AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SIPPLE, MARTIN B PO BOX 391 TALLAHASSEE FL 32302-0391 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/31/2021 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: De Cardenas William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970212AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SIPPLE, MARTIN B PO BOX 391 TALLAHASSEE FL 32302-0391 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/24/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970092AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:SIPPLE, MARTIN B PO BOX 391 TALLAHASSEE FL 32302-0391 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/24/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Copy of:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPPLE, MARTIN