This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/08/2021 at 16:52:16 (UTC).

AMERICA CAMERO VS SUTNAMIS GONZALEZ DDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 AMERICA CAMERO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SUTNAMIS GONZALEZ DDS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMERO, AMERICA

Defendants

GONZALEZ DDS, SUTNAMIS

SAGE DENTAL GROUP OF FLORIDA PLLC

SAGE DENTAL OF WEST KENDALL PLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jose Menendez

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth W Morgan Jr

Brown, Christine Anne

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

04/21/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Request for Production

06/12/2020 - Request for Production

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/11/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

07/06/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/18/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Production

08/04/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Motion to Compel

09/24/2020 - Motion to Compel

Response to Request for Production

08/04/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Unavailability/absence

11/03/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Mot to File Amended Complaint

10/29/2021 - Mot to File Amended Complaint

Notice of Hearing-

10/26/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

10/19/2021 - Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

Certificate of No Objections to Production

09/27/2021 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Certificate of No Objections to Production

09/27/2021 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Notice of Compliance

09/17/2021 - Notice of Compliance

Request for Copies

09/16/2021 - Request for Copies

Request for Copies

09/16/2021 - Request for Copies

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Calendar Call; Hearing Code: CALND; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Calendar Call; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY AND LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event; Comments: DECEMBER 27, 2021-DECEMBER 31, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mot to File Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of No Objections to Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of No Objections to Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590277AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JOSE MENENDEZ6701 SUNSET DR STE 104MIAMI FL 33143-4529COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/12/2020REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAGE DENTAL GROUP OF FLORIDA PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jose Menendez