This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/17/2020 at 23:19:15 (UTC).

AMBAS, CARMEN M VS ALVAREZ, JOSE RAMON

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 AMBAS, CARMEN M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALVAREZ, JOSE RAMON. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Ambas, Carmen

Ambas, Carmen M

Respondents

Alvarez, Jose R

Alvarez, Jose Ramon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Yablen, Barry A.

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

01/07/2020 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 23-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31770:4105; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1-7-20 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: JOSE ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event; Comments: JOSE RAMON ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510018AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:YABLEN, BARRY A. 2121 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 550 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-5222 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Designating Primary Email Address; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.