This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/31/2022 at 22:31:01 (UTC).

AMB HTD - BEACON CENTRE, LLC VS ARCP RL PORTFOLIO I, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 AMB HTD - BEACON CENTRE, LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against ARCP RL PORTFOLIO I, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMB HTD - BEACON CENTRE, LLC

Defendant

ARCP RL PORTFOLIO I, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Shane Patrick

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/29/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/29/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/31/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/03/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

08/06/2020 - Service Returned

Notice:

08/12/2020 - Notice:

Stipulation for Dismissal

08/20/2020 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

10/26/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

10/26/2020 - Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32167:1415; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ARCP RL PORTFOLIO I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF AGREED EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ARCP RL PORTFOLIO I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630243AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MARTIN, SHANE PATRICK2 S BISCAYNE BLVDMIAMI FL 33131-1806COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/01/2020REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630038AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:MARTIN, SHANE PATRICK2 S BISCAYNE BLVDMIAMI FL 33131-1806COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/31/2020REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCP RL PORTFOLIO I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMB HTD - BEACON CENTRE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Shane Patrick