This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 01:39:41 (UTC).

AMANDA COHEN VS PARC CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. ( THE) ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 AMANDA COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PARC CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC THE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cohen, Amanda

Defendants

Parc Condominium Association, Inc. ( The)

Otis Elevator Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scher, Adam G

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/05/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/05/2022 - Complaint

Request for Production

05/05/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

05/05/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

05/05/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/06/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/06/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

05/13/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/18/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/18/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/18/2022 - Service Returned

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: THE PARC CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050054AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:SCHER, ADAM G1720 HARRISON ST STE 18AHOLLYWOOD FL 33020-6836COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:05/07/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Otis Elevator Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Parc Condominium Association Inc. ( The)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080188AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:SCHER, ADAM G1720 HARRISON ST STE 18AHOLLYWOOD FL 33020-6836COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/06/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARC CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (THE) is a litigant

Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scher, Adam G