Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/07/2021 at 00:57:59 (UTC).

ALLY BANK VS NESTOR MELENDEZ RINCON

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 ALLY BANK filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against NESTOR MELENDEZ RINCON. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendant

Melendez Rincon, Nestor

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/19/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/19/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

04/06/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/06/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 3:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Show Cause; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570192AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:AMY WEAVER (ESQ) LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP. 4630 WOODLAND CORPORATE BLVD TAMPA FL 33614 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Melendez Rincon Nestor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Show Cause; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610235AMT PAID:$486.00 NAME:AMY WEAVER (ESQ) LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP. 4630 WOODLAND CORPORATE BLVD TAMPA FL 33614 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 3134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$486.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/08/2021 REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Bank is a litigant