Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/16/2021 at 22:59:24 (UTC).

ALLY BANK VS. L S C BUS SVC (LLC) ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 ALLY BANK filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against L S C BUS SVC LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendants

Chery, Lee Scott

L S C Bus Svc (LLC)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy Weaver (esq)

 

Court Documents

Motion:

05/04/2021 - Motion:

Complaint

04/15/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ENTRY OF REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660052AMT PAID:$385.00 NAME:AMY WEAVER (ESQ) LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP. 4630 WOODLAND CORPORATE BLVD TAMPA FL 33614 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 2134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$385.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/17/2021 REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $13275.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weaver, Amy, ESQ.