This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/05/2019 at 23:03:44 (UTC).

ALLIANCE SPINE & JOINT II, INC. VS LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 ALLIANCE SPINE JOINT II, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE SPINE & JOINT II, INC.

Assignor

Stokes, Connie

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rock, Gregory

Defendant Attorney

Hernandez, Keith

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

04/25/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

04/05/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Letter of Correspondence

03/27/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Interrogatory

03/27/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

03/27/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/27/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

03/27/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

03/27/2019 - Email Notice:

Memorandum of Disposition

03/25/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/22/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Pre Trial Summons

02/21/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/01/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130006AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/21/2019 REGISTER#:313CASHIER:NAB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500019AMT PAID:$80.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/05/2019 REGISTER#:350CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less