This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/23/2020 at 23:27:35 (UTC).

ALLIANCE MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 ALLIANCE MEDICAL SERVICES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alliance Medical Services, Inc.

Assignor

Benavides, Yaritza

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leon, John Williams

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

05/18/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice:

04/17/2020 - Notice:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/26/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/25/2020 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

03/25/2020 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Letter of Correspondence

03/24/2020 - Letter of Correspondence

Email Notice:

03/24/2020 - Email Notice:

Notice of Service of Process

03/24/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

02/27/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31939:2757; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460018AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/27/2020 REGISTER#:346CASHIER:LEB2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440075AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:LEON, JOHN WILLIAMS 8000 GOVERNOR'S SQUARE BLVD PH404 MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.