This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/29/2023 at 07:24:43 (UTC).

ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SVCS VS UNITED AUTO INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SVCS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTO INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

All X-Ray Diagnostic Svcs

Assignor

Garcia, Alexis

Defendant

United Auto Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, Brion M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/17/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/17/2023 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/23/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/08/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

02/22/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Request for Admissions

07/25/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

07/25/2023 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Auto Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: United Auto Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060046AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ROSS, BRION M.1 E BROWARD BLVD STE 700FT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/16/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140572AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:ROSS, BRION M.1 E BROWARD BLVD STE 700FT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:01/18/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $432.64

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less