This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/18/2023 at 13:11:43 (UTC).

ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2023 ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP.

Assignor

PEREZ, TOMASA

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sorensen, Jon

Defendant Attorney

White, Camille A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/02/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/02/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

01/02/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/02/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/02/2023 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

01/02/2023 - Email Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/09/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/25/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Admissions

03/25/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Stipulation

03/25/2023 - Stipulation

Notice of Appearance

03/25/2023 - Notice of Appearance

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170032AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SORENSEN, JON815 N. HOMESTEAD BLVD., #511HOMESTEAD FL 33030COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/28/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160043AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:SORENSEN, JON815 N. HOMESTEAD BLVD., #511HOMESTEAD FL 33030COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:01/05/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less