This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/22/2023 at 15:00:57 (UTC).

ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP. VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All X-Ray Diagnostic Services, Corp.

Rodriguez, Hernan

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coyle, Melisa L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/02/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/05/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Filing:

01/04/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice:

01/11/2023 - Notice:

Order of Dismissal

01/11/2023 - Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33540:2070; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2770001AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$200.00RECEIPT DATE:12/15/2022REGISTER#:277CASHIER:AIDAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140061AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:COYLE, MELISA L.407 LINCOLN RD STE 8EMIAMI BEACH FL 33139-3025COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:12/03/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less