This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/21/2022 at 10:13:53 (UTC).

ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP. VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP.

FERNANDEZ, RAUL

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coyle, Melisa L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/02/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/05/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2770098AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$200.00RECEIPT DATE:12/15/2022REGISTER#:277CASHIER:AIDAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140081AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:COYLE, MELISA L.407 LINCOLN RD STE 8EMIAMI BEACH FL 33139-3025COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:12/03/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coyle, Melisa L.