Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/05/2019 at 18:51:45 (UTC).

ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Hernandez, Juan C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorneys

Barrangan, Arlene

Gaspari, Albert J., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/29/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Memorandum of Disposition

04/29/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Appearance

04/08/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Voluntary Dismissal

03/25/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Pre Trial Summons

03/20/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

03/12/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31381:442; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2810080AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$250.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/20/2019 REGISTER#:281CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580051AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Neil M