Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/25/2021 at 17:44:08 (UTC).

ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All X-Ray Diagnostic Services, Corp.

Vives, Yanet

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coyle, Melisa L.

Defendant Attorneys

Barrangan, Arlene

Quintero, Rebeca

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

12/25/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/25/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Voluntary Dismissal

01/14/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

11/03/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

10/29/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing:

10/16/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Pre Trial Summons

10/06/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Production

10/05/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

10/05/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

10/05/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

09/29/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/29/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32295:4067; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Miami Beach Courtroom 2-1 1130 Washington Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2340037AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$130.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/06/2020 REGISTER#:234CASHIER:DYROFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790014AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:COYLE, MELISA L. 407 LINCOLN RD STE 8E MIAMI BEACH FL 33139-3025 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/01/2020 REGISTER#:279CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barrangan, Arlene

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quintero, Rebeca