Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/09/2021 at 00:04:00 (UTC).

ALL PRO RESTORATION SERVICES VS FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 ALL PRO RESTORATION SERVICES filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL PRO RESTORATION SERVICES

Defendant

FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKOS, OMAR

Defendant Attorney

Gutterman, Marc

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

02/22/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/22/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610001AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BAKOS, OMAR 2423 SW 147TH AVENUE #252 MIAMI FL 33185 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2021 REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650174AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:BAKOS, OMAR 2423 SW 147TH AVENUE #252 MIAMI FL 33185 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/23/2021 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gutterman, Marc Jason