This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/29/2023 at 18:09:49 (UTC).

ALL-PRO ORTHOPEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE, P.A., VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 ALL-PRO ORTHOPEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE, P A , filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL-PRO ORTHOPEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE, P.A.,

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

Assignee

Santiago, Nancy A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

White, T Roger, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Kalish, Ari, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/23/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

02/23/2023 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/27/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/03/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Interrogatory

03/14/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

03/14/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/14/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Process

03/23/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Motion for Extension of Time

04/03/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Witness List

04/23/2023 - Witness List

Exhibit List

04/23/2023 - Exhibit List

Witness List

04/23/2023 - Witness List

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

05/03/2023 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Motion for Default

05/16/2023 - Motion for Default

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230015AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR.9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/07/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210010AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR.9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less