This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/25/2023 at 02:04:43 (UTC).

ALFRED RIOS VS LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 ALFRED RIOS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIOS, ALFRED

Defendant

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leo A Manzanilla

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/11/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/11/2023 - Complaint

Email Notice:

01/11/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/11/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/11/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/11/2023 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/12/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/17/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

01/31/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

02/09/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

02/09/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/09/2023 - Request for Production

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

02/21/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/02/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

03/02/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

03/17/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100052AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LEO A MANZANILLA770 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 101CORAL GABLES FL 33134-2066COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/14/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000256AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LEO A MANZANILLA770 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 101CORAL GABLES FL 33134-2066COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/12/2023REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE@MSPGLAWGROUP.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less