This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/15/2021 at 07:05:13 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO RODRIGUEZ VS LUIS SUAREZ

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 ALEJANDRO RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS SUAREZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Alejandro

Defendant

Suarez, Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reyes, Adrian

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

04/16/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Suarez Luis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590150AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:REYES, ADRIAN 2300 WEST 84TH STREET SUITE 302 HIALEAH FL 33016-5773 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2021 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570144AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:REYES, ADRIAN 2300 WEST 84TH STREET SUITE 302 HIALEAH FL 33016-5773 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reyes, Adrian