This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/08/2021 at 16:02:54 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO BADIA VS CITY OF MIAMI CODE ENFORCEMENT BOARD

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 ALEJANDRO BADIA filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF MIAMI CODE ENFORCEMENT BOARD. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

Badia, Alejandro

Appellee

City of Miami Code Enforcement Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Kubs Lalchandani

Peasant, Bibiana

Appellee Attorneys

Dooley, Rachel S.G.

Greco, John A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Administrative Appeal

06/30/2021 - Notice of Administrative Appeal

Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

06/30/2021 - Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

Notice of Appearance

07/08/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Text

07/09/2021 - Text

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATEMENT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550001AMT PAID:$281.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3063-ADMIN APPEAL CIRCU1$281.00$281.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$281.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/09/2021 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:YENORYG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Estimated Cost Received; Event Type: Event; Comments: $281.00 FILING FEE Complete Date: 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: CITY OF MIAMI AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event; Comments: $281.00 FILING FEE DUE JULY 15, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Assigned To; Event Type: Event; Comments: JACQUELINE ABU-NASSAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Administrative Appeal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greco, John A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dooley, Rachel S.G.