This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 11:29:10 (UTC).

ALC MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 ALC MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALC MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

MUGUERCIA CREME, ORESTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antonella Dos Santos

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/14/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/14/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/23/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice:

06/28/2022 - Notice:

Email Notice:

06/28/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

06/28/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/28/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

06/28/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process

06/30/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE@DOSSANTOS.LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOT TO EXHAUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080015AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/18/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030116AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALC Medical Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antonella Dos Santos