This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/12/2021 at 03:04:06 (UTC).

ALAIN CLARO VS AUSTIN C LAMPERT

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 ALAIN CLARO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUSTIN C LAMPERT. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Claro, Alain

Defendant

Lampert, Austin C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

Defendant Attorney

Melmer, Ana Maria

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

09/22/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

09/17/2021 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Notice of Production

09/17/2021 - Notice of Production

Order on Motion to Compel

09/15/2021 - Order on Motion to Compel

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

09/14/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

09/10/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

09/03/2021 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Hearing-

08/30/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

08/22/2021 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Taking Deposition

08/16/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Extension of Time

07/30/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Case Management Report

07/27/2021 - Case Management Report

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/02/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Request for Admissions

07/02/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

07/02/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/10/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/28/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Trial (case at Issue); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT S ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DATED SEPTEMBER 10, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Lampert Austin C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590237AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JORGE J GARCIA 2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2021 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590089AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JORGE J GARCIA 2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2021 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melmer, Ana Maria