This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 15:25:57 (UTC).

AJX MORTGAGE TRUST I, A DELAWARE TRUST, WILMINGTON VS CLYDE A. WILLIAMS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 AJX MORTGAGE TRUST I, A DELAWARE TRUST, WILMINGTON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLYDE A WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AJX MORTGAGE TRUST I, A DELAWARE TRUST, WILMINGTON

Defendants

WILLIAMS, CLYDE A.

WILLIAMS, MARILYN

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

LESLIE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION NO.3, INC

MAZDA AMERICA CREDIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan B Lamchick (esq)

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/30/2022 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

07/01/2022 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

07/01/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/11/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/11/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/11/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/11/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/11/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

08/03/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/03/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

08/08/2022 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: WILLIAMS CLYDE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: WILLIAMS CLYDE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: LESLIE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION NO.3 INC

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020094AMT PAID:$50.00NAME:RYAN B LAMCHICK (ESQ)LAMCHICK LAW GROUP PA 6910 N. KENDALL DRIVE FIRSTPINECREST FL 33156-2944COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:07/08/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030229AMT PAID:$1,911.00NAME:RYAN B LAMCHICK (ESQ)LAMCHICK LAW GROUP PA 6910 N. KENDALL DRIVE FIRSTPINECREST FL 33156-2944COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,911.00RECEIPT DATE:07/02/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33271:3279; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAZDA AMERICAN CREDIT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LESLIE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION NO 3 INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AJX MORTGAGE TRUST I A DELAWARE TRUST WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant