This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/09/2021 at 05:29:54 (UTC).

AJTB, INC. VS ILLUMINA MEDICAL GROUP I

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 AJTB, INC filed an Other lawsuit against ILLUMINA MEDICAL GROUP I. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AJTB, Inc.

Defendant

Illumina Medical Group I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Will Morris

Defendant Attorney

Alvarez, Hugo V.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/06/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/06/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

10/06/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion to Transfer

10/22/2020 - Motion to Transfer

Motion for Extension of Time

10/22/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Hearing-

10/29/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

11/05/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Recommended Transfer Order

11/18/2020 - Recommended Transfer Order

Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:

12/08/2020 - Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:

Order:

03/05/2021 - Order:

Order of Dismissal

04/07/2021 - Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

04/07/2021 - Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

04/07/2021 - Order of Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32439:3582; Event Type: Event; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SETTING STATUS HEARING ON APRIL 7, 2021 AT 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER DETERMINING TRIAL JUDGE ALAN FINE.WHO IS CURRENTLY ASSIGNED TO RELATED CIRCUIT COURT CASE 20-6960 C A 01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:40AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Recommended Transfer Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Alvarez Hugo V.; Illumina Medical Group I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Transfer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Illumina Medical Group I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760082AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:J WILL MORRIS MORRIS LEGAL, LLC 2800 BISCAYNE BLVD SUITE 530 MIAMI FL 33137 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/07/2020 REGISTER#:276CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760069AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:J WILL MORRIS MORRIS LEGAL, LLC 2800 BISCAYNE BLVD SUITE 530 MIAMI FL 33137 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/07/2020 REGISTER#:276CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ILLUMINA, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alvarez, Hugo V.