This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/05/2023 at 20:45:24 (UTC).

AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY CO. VS NEWPORT PROPERTY CONSTRUCTION LTD

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY CO filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against NEWPORT PROPERTY CONSTRUCTION LTD. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIG Property Casualty Co.

Assignor

Rodriguez, Alexander

Defendant

Newport Property Construction Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart F. Cohen

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/18/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/18/2022 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

11/18/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

11/18/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

11/18/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/28/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Affidavit of Service

12/01/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Notice of Appearance

12/29/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

12/29/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: NEWPORT PROPERTY CONSTRUCTION, LTD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Newport Property Construction Ltd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110213AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:STUART F. COHEN3440 HOLLYWOOD BLVD FL 2HOLLYWOOD FL 33021-6927COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/23/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140066AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:STUART F. COHEN3440 HOLLYWOOD BLVD FL 2HOLLYWOOD FL 33021-6927COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/22/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart F. Cohen