This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/03/2022 at 17:18:43 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 AFO IMAGING filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AFO IMAGING

Assignor

Hibbert, Lama

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

La Montagne, Rachel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/26/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

09/26/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

09/27/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/10/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

11/11/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

11/17/2022 - Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160175AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/13/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100274AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:09/27/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer La Montagne, Rachel