This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/16/2023 at 09:22:49 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING, INC. VS TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (THE)

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 AFO IMAGING, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY THE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Afo Imaging, Inc.

Group, Advanced Diagnostic

Assignor

Rodriguez, Yeneisi

Defendant

Travelers Home And Marine Insurance Company (The)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

Defendant Attorney

Fox, Kaitlin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/17/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

02/17/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

02/17/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/17/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

02/17/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

02/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/27/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/02/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

03/07/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Mot to File Amended Complaint

03/29/2023 - Mot to File Amended Complaint

Amended Statement of Claim

03/29/2023 - Amended Statement of Claim

Notice of Appearance

04/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mot to File Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210021AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/04/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Travelers Home And Marine Insurance Company (The)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180004AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:02/22/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less