This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/24/2020 at 06:24:53 (UTC).

AFFILIATED HEALTHCARE CENTERS, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 AFFILIATED HEALTHCARE CENTERS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Affiliated Healthcare Centers, Inc.

Assignor

Green, Tremetrice

Defendants

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Ocean Harbor Casualty Ins. Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thayer Musa

 

Court Documents

Notice:

04/10/2020 - Notice:

Request for Production

04/10/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/10/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

04/10/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Amended Statement of Claim

04/10/2020 - Amended Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

04/07/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

04/07/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

04/07/2020 - Email Notice:

Request for Production

04/07/2020 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

04/07/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/07/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2430043AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:THAYER MUSA 9008 SW 152ND ST PALMETTO BAY FL 33157 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.