This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/31/2020 at 06:46:47 (UTC).

AFCAM RESTORATION, CORP.ADRIAN NUNEZ VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 AFCAM RESTORATION, CORP ADRIAN NUNEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AFCAM Restoration, Corp.Adrian Nunez

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Acevedo, Brandy

 

Court Documents

Request:

04/07/2020 - Request:

Request for Production

04/07/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

04/07/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

04/07/2020 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

04/07/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/07/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2040008AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$110.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/22/2020 REGISTER#:204CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2430025AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:ACEVEDO, BRANDY 12595 SW 137TH AVENUESUITE 307 MIAMI FL 33186 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.