This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/23/2019 at 04:59:02 (UTC).

AFCAM RESTORATION A/A/O ROSA ARCAY VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 AFCAM RESTORATION A/A/O ROSA ARCAY filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AFCAM RESTORATION a/a/o Rosa Arcay

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alvarez-Jacinto, Manuel, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

Baer, Adam Philip

Harris Katz

Blanco, Hailey R

 

Court Documents

Motion to Transfer

05/10/2019 - Motion to Transfer

Request for Production

05/02/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/26/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion for Extension of Time

04/26/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/27/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Email Notice:

02/25/2019 - Email Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

02/01/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/16/2019 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

01/16/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

05/02/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Production

04/26/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

04/26/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion to Strike

04/08/2019 - Motion to Strike

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

04/03/2019 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Memorandum of Disposition

02/27/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Appearance

02/25/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

01/16/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/16/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Transfer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Alvarez-Jacinto Manuel ESQ; AFCAM RESTORATION a/a/o Rosa Arcay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590010AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$70.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2019 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450022AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:ALVAREZ-JACINTO, MANUEL, ESQ SILVERBEFG / BRITO, PLLC 1200 NW 78TH AVENUE, SUIT MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.