This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 08:12:44 (UTC).

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS & PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.L. VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS PAIN MANAGEMENT, P L filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS & PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.L.

Assignor

Salas, Airon

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/01/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/05/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/12/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/19/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090151AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/14/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150394AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS & PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.L. is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.