This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 19:40:34 (UTC).

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

Assignor

Hobbs, Karen

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/16/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/16/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/16/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

06/29/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Request for Production

06/29/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/29/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

06/29/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

06/29/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing Deposition

06/29/2022 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/06/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Voluntary Dismissal

07/11/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33283:4417; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160017AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/18/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130134AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/17/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.