This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/25/2022 at 09:01:10 (UTC).

ADAS WINDSHIELD CALIBRATIONS LLC VS LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 ADAS WINDSHIELD CALIBRATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAS WINDSHIELD CALIBRATIONS LLC

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/22/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

11/28/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Interrogatory

11/29/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

11/29/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

11/29/2022 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090025AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:WULWICK, JONATHAN D.3100 N 29TH CT STE 100HOLLYWOOD FL 33020COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/30/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2100278AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:WULWICK, JONATHAN D.3100 N 29TH CT STE 100HOLLYWOOD FL 33020COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:11/28/2022REGISTER#:210CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADAS WINDSHIELD CALIBRATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant