This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/07/2020 at 02:24:42 (UTC).

ADACIA DOUGLAS VS JOHN SANDERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 ADACIA DOUGLAS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against JOHN SANDERS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas, Adacia

Defendants

Sanders, John

Public Storage

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

06/03/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Order of Recusal

05/27/2020 - Order of Recusal

Order of Recusal

05/20/2020 - Order of Recusal

Ord of Recusal/ord of Reassign

05/20/2020 - Ord of Recusal/ord of Reassign

Service Returned

04/30/2020 - Service Returned

Email Notice:

04/17/2020 - Email Notice:

Motion to Dismiss

04/10/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing-

04/10/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Service Returned

03/27/2020 - Service Returned

Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency

02/14/2020 - Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency

Affidavit of Indigency

02/14/2020 - Affidavit of Indigency

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Recusal; Event Type: Event; Comments: TRANSFER ORDER ON RECUSAL TO DIVISION 04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Recusal; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUDGE HAS BEEN ASSIGN TO SECTION (CA 04 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Ord of Recusal/ord of Reassign; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Sanders John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Public Storage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Sanders John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2450029AMT PAID:$55.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3120-COPY5$1.00$5.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3140-SHERIFF'S FEE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110046AMT PAID:$401.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2020 REGISTER#:211CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indigency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less