Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/06/2021 at 21:49:14 (UTC).

ADA AGUILAR VS FRESH-N-CLEAN STORE SERVICE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 ADA AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FRESH-N-CLEAN STORE SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aguilar, Ada

Defendants

Fresh-N-Clean Store Service Inc

Burlington Coat Factory Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ruben V. Chavez, Esquire

Defendant Attorneys

Robert M Pickett

Hardee, Katina Michelle

Potucek, William A.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

02/25/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice:

02/22/2021 - Notice:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

02/19/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

02/18/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Response to Request for Production

02/11/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice:

02/03/2021 - Notice:

Order Extending Time for

01/29/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Order Extending Time for

01/26/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Request for Production

01/12/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Hearing-

01/11/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

01/08/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Extension of Time

12/30/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Production

12/30/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Production

12/30/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Production

12/30/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

12/30/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

11/25/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/25/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Robert M Pickett; Fresh-N-Clean Store Service Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF INSPECTION OF PLAINTIFF ADA AGUILAR'S SHOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Fresh-N-Clean Store Service Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Burlington Coat Factory Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540039AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:RUBEN V. CHAVEZ, ESQUIRE THE LAW OFFICES OF RUBEN V. CHAVEZ PA 10689 NORTHMIAMI FL 33176 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/03/2020 REGISTER#:254CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550119AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:RUBEN V. CHAVEZ, ESQUIRE THE LAW OFFICES OF RUBEN V. CHAVEZ PA 10689 NORTHMIAMI FL 33176 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/01/2020 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chavez, Ruben V