This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/16/2020 at 06:34:22 (UTC).

ACHINELLI, RICARDO E VS KAPLAN, FLORENCIA C

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 ACHINELLI, RICARDO E filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KAPLAN, FLORENCIA C. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Achinelli, Ricardo E

Respondent

Kaplan, Florencia C

Minors

Achinelli, Mateo

A, M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tejeda, Roxana Marie

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

11/05/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 21-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Book/Page: 31679:289; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: WITH PROPERTY AND MINOR DEPENDANT CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketUncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: ELENA 305.893.8003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMarital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event; Comments: PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11-05-191:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing Child Support Guidelines Worksheet Attached; Event Type: Event; Comments: PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: FLORENCIA KAPLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Completion of Parenting Class; Event Type: Event; Comments: FLOIRENCIA KAPLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Completion of Parenting Class; Event Type: Event; Comments: RICARDO ACHINELLI

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: FLORENCIA KAPLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580028AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:TEJEDA, ROXANA MARIE 12550 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 406 MIAMI FL 33181-2544 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketRequired Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketWaiver; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketWaiver of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketWaiver of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less