This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/27/2021 at 12:26:12 (UTC).

ACCU MED DIAGNOSTIC CENTERS VS WESCO INS CO

Case Summary

On 10/02/2021 ACCU MED DIAGNOSTIC CENTERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WESCO INS CO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Accu Med Diagnostic Centers

Assignor

Yepes, Richard

Defendant

Wesco Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael P Brodi

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Admissions

10/02/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

10/02/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/02/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

10/02/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/02/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Wesco Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110175AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MICHAEL P BRODI 2875 NE 191ST ST PH 4 AVENTURA FL 33180-2843 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/07/2021 REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000080AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:MICHAEL P BRODI 2875 NE 191ST ST PH 4 AVENTURA FL 33180-2843 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/05/2021 REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $13.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accu Med Diagnostic Centers is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P Brodi