This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/10/2021 at 02:37:53 (UTC).

ACCU MED DIAGNOSTIC CENTERS VS STANDARD FIRE INS CO (THE)

Case Summary

On 10/30/2021 ACCU MED DIAGNOSTIC CENTERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STANDARD FIRE INS CO THE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Accu Med Diagnostic Centers

Assignor

Yau Lu, Jenny

Defendant

Standard Fire Ins Co (The)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael P Brodi

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/30/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

10/30/2021 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

10/30/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

10/30/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

10/30/2021 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

12/02/2021 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

12/02/2021 - Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Standard Fire Ins Co (The)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080123AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL P BRODI2875 NE 191ST ST PH 4AVENTURA FL 33180-2843COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/09/2021REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090084AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:MICHAEL P BRODI2875 NE 191ST ST PH 4AVENTURA FL 33180-2843COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:11/02/2021REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $267.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accu Med Diagnostic Centers is a litigant

Latest cases where Standard Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P Brodi