This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/25/2021 at 10:32:25 (UTC).

ACCREDITED SURETY & CASUALTY CO INC VS EXCELL COLLISION CENTER (LLC)

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 ACCREDITED SURETY CASUALTY CO INC filed an Other lawsuit against EXCELL COLLISION CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Accredited Surety & Casualty Co Inc

Defendant

Excell Collision Center (LLC)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Udine

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/08/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

10/08/2021 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

10/19/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

11/09/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610052AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/19/2021REGISTER#:261CASHIER:AT17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Excell Collision Center (LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040101AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:MICHAEL UDINE9900 W SAMPLE RD STE 201CORAL SPRINGS FL 33065-4009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:10/09/2021REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $5545.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Excell Collision Center, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Udine, Michael I, ESQ.