This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/07/2020 at 08:49:10 (UTC).

ABREU VIGOA, JOSE CARLOS VS FALERO MARTINEZ, GREITY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 ABREU VIGOA, JOSE CARLOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FALERO MARTINEZ, GREITY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Abreu Vigoa, Jose Carlos

Respondent

Falero Martinez, Greity

Minors

Abreu Falero, Carlos Daniel

Abreu Falero, Carlos Andres

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUESTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Falero Martinez Greity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Collaborative Law Information Sheet; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Abreu Vigoa Jose Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Courses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Abreu Vigoa Jose Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2710002AMT PAID:$459.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3340-SHERIFF - DADE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at South Dade; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.