This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/04/2020 at 11:25:44 (UTC).

ABL ONE, LLC VS 19 NW 109 ST MIAMI SHORES, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 ABL ONE, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 19 NW 109 ST MIAMI SHORES, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABL One, LLC

Defendants

Principal Lenders Group, Inc.

Padilla, Santiago

Mac Real Estate Services, Inc.

19 NW 109 ST Miami Shores, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William S Frazier

Defendant Attorney

Richard K.Stanton

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default

03/31/2020 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

03/16/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/16/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/12/2020 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/12/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Summons Returned - No Service

02/10/2020 - Summons Returned - No Service

Motion for Default

01/29/2020 - Motion for Default

Summons Returned - No Service

01/13/2020 - Summons Returned - No Service

Answer

12/31/2019 - Answer

Default

12/31/2019 - Default

Motion for Default

12/30/2019 - Motion for Default

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

Certificate

11/19/2019 - Certificate

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/19/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

11/18/2019 - Lis Pendens

Civil Cover

11/18/2019 - Civil Cover

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Padilla Santiago

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: 19 NW 109 ST Miami Shores LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460234AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:WILLIAM S FRAZIER 1919 BLANDING BLVD STE 8 JACKSONVILLE FL 32210-3254 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.0

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600295AMT PAID:$1,911.00 NAME:WILLIAM S FRAZIER 1919 BLANDING BLVD STE 8 JACKSONVILLE FL 32210-3254 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1 $1,906.00 $1,906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31702:290; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less