This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/05/2020 at 12:28:55 (UTC).

AARONS SALES AND LEASE VS. YESENIA TREJOS

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 AARONS SALES AND LEASE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YESENIA TREJOS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aarons Sales and Lease

Defendant

Trejos, Yesenia

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

06/18/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Pre Trial Summons

05/29/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

03/26/2020 - Service Returned

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Pre Trial Summons

02/14/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE (DUE TO COVID-19 NO LIVE COURT APPEARANCES ONLY VIRTUAL, SEE ATTACHED ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS FOR HEARING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08/12/2020@10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Trejos Yesenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Trejos Yesenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2460016AMT PAID:$225.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2140-SHERIFF'S FEE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Trejos Yesenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Coral Gables; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.