This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:56:39 (UTC).

A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES,LLC VS VW CREDIT , INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 A AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES,LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VW CREDIT , INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES,LLC

Defendants

VW CREDIT , INC

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

VIERA, MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antelo, Orlando, Jr

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/19/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Appearance

05/19/2022 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

06/20/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/22/2022 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: VIERA MANUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: VW CREDITINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020027AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:ANTELO, ORLANDO, JR.2103 CORAL WAY STE 805MIAMI FL 33145-2637COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:05/28/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070095AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ANTELO, ORLANDO, JR.2103 CORAL WAY STE 805MIAMI FL 33145-2637COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/21/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VW CREDIT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antelo, Orlando, Jr