This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/27/2022 at 08:38:50 (UTC).

A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC VS NADIA DE LA PENA

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 A AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NADIA DE LA PENA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC

Defendant

DE LA PENA, NADIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antelo, Orlando, Jr

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/01/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Appearance

06/01/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

06/08/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Voluntary Dismissal

07/11/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Returned

07/15/2022 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33283:1561; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DE LA PENA NADIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2710009AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:271CASHIER:JAREDC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DE LA PENA NADIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130164AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:ANTELO, ORLANDO, JR.2103 CORAL WAY STE 805MIAMI FL 33145-2637COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antelo, Orlando, Jr