This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/10/2022 at 12:58:18 (UTC).

A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC VS JUDITH BLAKE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 A AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUDITH BLAKE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

BLAKE, JUDITH

BLAKE, HECTOR E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antelo, Orlando, Jr

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/01/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Appearance

06/01/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

06/08/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Pre Trial Summons

06/08/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

06/15/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/15/2022 - Service Returned

Notice of Limited Appearance

07/27/2022 - Notice of Limited Appearance

Notice:

07/29/2022 - Notice:

Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

08/04/2022 - Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediation; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Referral to Mediation Unit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIMITED NOTICE OFAPPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:30AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Limited Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2710010AMT PAID:$20.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:271CASHIER:JAREDC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BLAKE JUDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BLAKE HECTOR E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130169AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:ANTELO, ORLANDO, JR.2103 CORAL WAY STE 805MIAMI FL 33145-2637COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A+ AUTO COLLISION CENTER SERVICES, LLC is a litigant