This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/17/2020 at 03:21:30 (UTC).

900 APARTMENTS LLC VS VOYAGER INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 900 APARTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against VOYAGER INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

900 APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

VOYAGER INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Klotzman, Scott Eric

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/30/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/25/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Letter of Correspondence

09/24/2020 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Interrogatory

09/24/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

09/24/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

09/24/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

09/24/2020 - Notice:

Complaint

09/24/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VOYAGER INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660108AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:KLOTZMAN, SCOTT ERIC LAW OFFICIES OF SCOTT KLOTZMAN PA 2001 TYLER STREE HOLLYWOOD FL 33020-4821 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760137AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:KLOTZMAN, SCOTT ERIC LAW OFFICIES OF SCOTT KLOTZMAN PA 2001 TYLER STREE HOLLYWOOD FL 33020-4821 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less