This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 16:47:29 (UTC).

66 HIALEAH APARTMENTS, LLC VS. AMANDA VILLATORO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 66 HIALEAH APARTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AMANDA VILLATORO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

66 Hialeah Apartments, LLC

Defendant

Villatoro, Amanda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pensky, Jason A

 

Court Documents

Default Final Judgment

12/09/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Order:

12/10/2019 - Order:

Reply to Answer

12/09/2019 - Reply to Answer

Default Final Judgment

12/09/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Motion to Strike

12/04/2019 - Motion to Strike

Non-Military Affidavit

12/04/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Service Returned

12/02/2019 - Service Returned

Answer

11/22/2019 - Answer

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSWER DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENIED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31736:4570; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Villatoro Amanda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Villatoro Amanda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960050AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/20/2019 REGISTER#:296CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Villatoro Amanda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Villatoro Amanda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3670006AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:PENSKY, JASON A JASON PENSKY 12550 BISCAYNE BLVD SUITE 401 NORTH MIAMI FL 33181 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.