This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/04/2020 at 10:34:32 (UTC).

441 CHIROPRACTIC & ACUPUNCTURE, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 441 CHIROPRACTIC ACUPUNCTURE, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

441 Chiropractic & Acupuncture, Inc.

Assignor

Ramsley Charles

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul K Schrier

Defendant Attorneys

Amador-Walled, Marcella Lizbeth

Amador-Walled, Marcella L.

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

03/26/2020 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Motion for Extension of Time

01/31/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

01/08/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/07/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

01/02/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

11/18/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

11/18/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140004AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/03/2019 REGISTER#:314CASHIER:KWILLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3670009AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:PAUL K SCHRIER 11098 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 208 MIAMI FL 33161-7486 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.